EP1036666 - Ink-jet recording sheet containing aluminium and magnesium salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 4-1, Ohji 1-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 4-1, Ohji 1-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatani, Akinobu, Nippon Paper Indust. Co., Ltd. Res.Lab. of Product Dev., 30-6 Kami-ochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Noboru, Nippon Paper Industries Co., Ltd. Res.Lab. of Product Dev., 30-6 Kami-ochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ueno, Takashi, Nippon Paper Industries Co., Ltd. Res.Lab. of Product Dev., 30-6 Kami-ochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kuroyama, Yoshihiro, Nippon Paper Indust. Co., Ltd Res.Lab. of Product Dev., 30-6 Kami-ochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302013.8 | 13.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | JP19990068553 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6855399 | JP19990091403 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9140399 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036666 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036666 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP);
B41M2205/38 (EP);
B41M5/506 (EP);
B41M5/5227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/23] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsblatt, das Aluminium- und Magnesiumsalze enthält | [2000/38] | English: | Ink-jet recording sheet containing aluminium and magnesium salts | [2000/38] | French: | Feuille pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre contenant des sels d'aluminium et de magnésium | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 20.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.05.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0436230 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 13 - line 26 * * page 3, line 49 - line 57 * * examples 15-24; claims 1,5,6,13,17,18 *; | [A]JPS6339372 ; | [A]EP0391308 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 1 - line 18 * * examples 1-10; claims 1-17 *; | [A]US4740420 (AKUTSU EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 26 * * claims 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880720), vol. 12, no. 257, Database accession no. (M - 719), & JP63039372 A 19880219 (CANON INCORPORATED) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |