EP1036963 - Cartridge-type mechanical seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamasaki, Hiroshi, Nippon Pillar Packing Co Ltd Sanda Factory, 541-1 Aza Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujinaga, Shigeyuki, Nippon Pillar Packing Co ltd. Sanda Factory, 541-1 Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Howson, Richard G.B. fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/38] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302121.9 | 15.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | JP19990070984 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7098499 | JP19990168067 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16806799 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036963 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1036963 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036963 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F16J15/348 (EP,US);
F16J15/002 (EP,US);
F16J15/26 (EP,US);
F16J15/3452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kassettengleitringdichtung | [2000/38] | English: | Cartridge-type mechanical seal | [2000/38] | French: | Garniture mécanique d'étanchéité de type cartouche | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 02.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4688807 (WARNER DALE J [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5356158 (SIMMONS BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, lines 41-61 * * figures 1,2 *[A] 7,8; | [XA]US5505465 (HORNSBY JOHN [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 1,2,5-7 * [A] 4; | [X]US5544897 (DI PIETRO LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 20-35 * * figures 1-3 * |