EP1036518 - Hair cutting apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apparicio, Richard Clement 64 Beeches Road Kidderminster Worcestershire DY11 5HZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Apparicio, Richard Clement 64 Beeches Road Kidderminster, Worcestershire DY11 5HZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [2000/38] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates, The Old Yard, Lower Town Claines, Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302176.3 | 17.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | GB19990006077 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9906077 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036518 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1036518 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A45D24/36 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
A45D24/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/23] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Haarschneidegerät und Verfahren | [2000/38] | English: | Hair cutting apparatus and method | [2000/38] | French: | Dispositif pour la coupe des cheveux et méthode | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1451562 (BABCOCK HENRY W) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]GB251972 (MICHEL KYRIASIS) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1205805 (TOURNIE A G) [X] 1-12 * page 1, column L, line 15; figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE3541340 (RASCHE ALFRED) [X] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US5213116 (STEIN SABRINA R [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, column 1, line 33 - line 35; figure 7 * |