EP1052604 - Lock protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rice, William 28E Mains Road Dundee, Scotland DD3 7RE / GB | 02 /
Dunbar, Stan North Cottage, Shank of Omachie Kingennie, Dundee, Scotland DD5 3PF / GB | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | Williamson, Brian, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302279.5 | 21.03.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | GB19990009404 | 24.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9909404 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052604 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052604 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, E05B15/16 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
E05B15/1614 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/201 (EP,US);
E05B17/2084 (EP,US);
E05B37/08 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7424 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7921 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/31] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schlossschutz | [2006/19] | English: | Lock protection | [2000/46] | French: | Protection pour serrure | [2000/46] |
Former [2000/46] | Schlossschutzvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 15.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 02.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3083563 (HARRY GREENWALD) [X] 1,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2111583 (SPEEDCRAFT LIMITED) [X] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,7; | [A]GB1451046 (PEAKE C) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5216910 (LIN JUI-CHANG [TW]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 31 - line 52; figure 2 *; | [A]AU526432B (GUYMER R G) [A] 1,5-7,9 * page 9, line 18 - page 13, line 16; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4342207 (HOLMES DANIEL L, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-13 * |