EP1039696 - Radio transmission in a local area network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugaya, Shigeru, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kamo, Takanobu, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Hidemasa, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302355.3 | 22.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990080100 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8010099 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039696 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039696 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039696 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04W48/14 (EP,US);
E04F15/06 (KR);
E04F2290/044 (KR);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/22] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Funkkommunikation in einem lokalen Netzwerk | [2000/39] | English: | Radio transmission in a local area network | [2000/39] | French: | Communication radio dans un réseau local | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Request for further processing for: | 17.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4549293 (CHRISTIAN J ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 3,6A-6E * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, lines 43-51 * * column 6, lines 1-26 *; | [A]US5133080 (BORRAS JAIME A [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4-7 * * column 2, lines 19-42 * * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 33 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 32 *; | [XA]US5553076 (BEHTASH SAMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 2 * * column 7, line 2 - column 9, line 61 * [A] 4-6,10; | [X]US5612948 (FETTE BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4,8,9 * * column 2, lines 37-47 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 13 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 9 * * column 8, lines 50-53 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 14 * * column 9, line 36 - column 10, line 40 *; | [E]EP1062768 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [E] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6 * * page 1, line 11 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 27 * * page 7, lines 8-26 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A] - "PACKET RELAY SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS LAN", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19960201), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 133 - 135, XP000559848 [A] 4-6,10 * the whole document * |