EP1039448 - Phase change recording with crystallization improving layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Rie Room 402, Gureisuhaimu-Ida, 35-7, Suehirocho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0030 / JP | 02 /
Kitaura, Hideki 33-2-2-2 Hikaridai 4-chome, Seikacho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Noboru 1-4-2, Kuzuhaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1104 / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302413.0 | 24.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990083312 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8331299 | JP19990326537 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32653799 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039448 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039448 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039448 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26, B41M5/26 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
G11B7/266 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24027 (KR);
G11B7/00454 (EP,US);
G11B7/2403 (EP,US);
G11B7/24035 (KR);
G11B7/24053 (KR);
G11B7/24062 (KR);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
G11B7/257 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25706 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2571 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25718 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
G11B7/2542 (EP,US);
G11B7/259 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | G11B7/00, G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/31] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Phasenwechselaufzeichnung mit Schicht zur Verbesserung der Kristallisation | [2000/39] | English: | Phase change recording with crystallization improving layer | [2000/39] | French: | Enregistrement à changement de phase avec couche pour amélioration de crystallisation | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03026442.8 / EP1396853 | EP05001400.0 / EP1526522 | EP05001401.8 / EP1526523 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0294039 ; | [Y]JPH023119 ; | [Y]JPS62209741 ; | [Y]JPH08315360 ; | [YA]US5135819 (ITO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15,40 * column 5, line 5 - line 12 * [A] 16; | [XY]EP0499273 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 17,18,20,22,24,25,30,39,41,42 * page 5, line 54 - line 56 * [Y] 19,26,27,30-38; | [Y]US5446723 (BEST MARGARET E [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 10; figure 2B *; | [Y]EP0683485 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 36 * column 4, line 27 - line 49; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5581539 (HORIE MICHIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 32* column 15, line 34 - line 40 *; | [Y]US5631895 (OKADA MITSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 11,31 * column 5, line 7 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5652036 (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP]) [Y] 11 * column 7, line 28 - line 35; figure 1 * * column 17, line 8 - line 30; table 2 *; | [Y]US5764619 (NISHIUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * column 14, line 36 - line 61 *; | [XYA]WO9847142 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12,21,22 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 11,13-15,26,27,30,33-35,37,40 [A] 3,9,15,16,27-29; | [XPDAY]EP0980068 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [XPD] 1-8,10,12,21,22 * reflecting WO 98/47142 published on 22.10.1998 in Gazette 1998/42.; page 3, line 6 - line 7 * * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 20 * * paragraph [0039] * * page 6, line 5 - line 10 * * page 6, line 23 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 7, line 39 - line 41 * * page 10, line 41 - line 43 * * page 17, line 36 - line 47 * * page 17; table 1 * [A] 27-29,3,9,15,16 [Y] 26,27,30,33-35,37,11,13-15,40,19,38,31; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900628), vol. 014, no. 301, Database accession no. (P - 1069), & JP02094039 A 19900404 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 23 * abstract * | [A] - Wörterbuch der Chemie, MÜNCHEN, DEUTSCHER TASCHENBUCH VERLAG, (199506), XP002176892 [A] 30 * page 37 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900315), vol. 014, no. 138, Database accession no. (P - 1022), & JP02003119 A 19900108 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880305), vol. 012, no. 071, Database accession no. (P - 673), & JP62209741 A 19870914 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08315360 A 19961129 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 31 * abstract * |