EP1039517 - Method of cleaning porous body, and process for producing porous body, non-porous film or bonded substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagata, Kenji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Satoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302429.6 | 24.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990083599 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8359999 | JP19990083600 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8360099 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039517 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039517 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306, H01L21/20, B08B3/12, H01L33/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/67057 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B08B3/08 (EP,US);
C11D7/261 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US);
H01L21/67051 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | H01L21/306, H01L21/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/40] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung eines porösen Körpers und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines porösen Körpers, einer nicht-porösen Schicht oder eines verbundenen Substrates | [2000/39] | English: | Method of cleaning porous body, and process for producing porous body, non-porous film or bonded substrate | [2000/39] | French: | Procédé de nettoyage d'un corps poreux et procédé de fabrication d'un corps poreux, d'un film non poreux ou d'un substrat soudé | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08241863 ; | [A]US3898351 (KENNISON ROBERT E, et al) [A] 10,26,38,52 * abstract ** column 4, line 25 - line 52 *; | [A]US4543130 (SHWARTZMAN STANLEY [US]) [A] 8,9,24,25,36,37,50,51 * abstract * * column 4, line 6 - line 10 *; | [Y]US4695327 (GREBINSKI THOMAS J [US]) [Y] 1-4,13-20,27-32,41-46,53-56 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - line 11 * * column 4, line 19 - line 26 *; | [Y]US5143103 (BASSO JAMES E [US], et al) [Y] 5-9,21-25,33-37,47-51 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - line 30 * * column 2, line 40 - line 53 *; | [Y]US5660642 (BRITTEN JERALD A [US]) [Y] 11,12,39,40 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5750000 (YONEHARA TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-25,27-37,39-51,53-56 * the whole document *; | [A]US5868866 (MAEKAWA TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 10,26,38,52 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - line 67 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08241863 A 19960917 (CANON INC) [A] 1-56 * abstract * | Examination | EP0810643 |