EP1038501 - Equipment and method for calibration and quality assurance of an ultrasonic bone analysis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLOGIC, INC. 35 Crosby Drive Bedford Massachusetts 01730-1401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states HOLOGIC, INC. 35 Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730-1401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Kevin E. 474 Putnam Ave, Apt. 2B Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
Barry, Donald 76 Marlboro Street Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | 03 /
Lamser, Dennis G. 60 Pleasant Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | 04 /
O'Brien, John P. 74 Elmira Street, Apt.2 Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US | 05 /
Stein Jay A. 314 Dartmouth Street Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302476.7 | 27.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990277838 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: US 277838 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038501 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/1074 (EP,US);
A61B8/0875 (EP,US);
A61B8/4209 (EP,US);
A61B8/587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Eichung und Qualitätssicherung eines Ultraschall Knochen Analysen Gerätes | [2000/39] | English: | Equipment and method for calibration and quality assurance of an ultrasonic bone analysis apparatus | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour calibrer et pour assurer la qualité d'un appareil d'analyse ultrasonique d'os | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576217 (MCCUE ULTRASONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 3 * column 8, line 2 - line 46 * * column 11, line 31 - column 12, line 37; table 6 *; | [A]EP0719520 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-6,17-21 * column 5, line 46 - column 16, line 7; tables 1-12 *; | [XA]EP0765635 (HOLOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-5,16-19,21,23,24 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 46; tables 1-10 * * column 5, line 30 - column 13, line 39 * [A] 14,15,25,26; | [PDXA]US5935073 (WILSON KEVIN E [US], et al) [PDX] 1-5,13,16-19,21,23,24 * column 3, line 26 - column 12, line 5; tables 1-10 *[A] 14,15,25,26 |