EP1049173 - Semiconductor devices with multiple power supplies and methods of manufacturing such devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Shigeto Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-k Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Gotoh, Kunihiko Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-k Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Hirochi, Katsuji Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-k Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302672.1 | 30.03.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | JP19990122928 | 28.04.1999 Original published format: JP 12292899 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049173 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L21/8234, H01L29/423, H01L21/28, H01L21/32 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H01L21/823462 (EP,KR);
H01L27/0629 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelemente mit mehrfacher Energieversorgung und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/44] | English: | Semiconductor devices with multiple power supplies and methods of manufacturing such devices | [2000/44] | French: | Dispositifs semiconducteurs avec des sources d'alimentations multiples et ses procédés de fabrication | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 22.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0114491 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 28; figures 4A-4F *; | [Y]US5748033 (KAVEH GOLNAZ [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 14 - line 50 *; | [A]DE3107543 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 19, line 25 - page 21, line 4; figures 20-24 *; | [A]EP0244367 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, column 6, line 36 - page 5, column 7, line 27; figures 11-13 *; | [A]EP0713249 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH1074843 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * figures 10,13 *; | [A]US5607868 (CHIDA NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 5 * figure 18 *; | [A]US5043781 (NISHIURA MASAHARU [JP], et al) [A] 10 * figure 9 *; | [A]US5264752 (SAVICKI JOSEPH P [US]) [A] 9,10 * column 2, line 25 - line 29 *; | [A]JPH07161928 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07161928 A 19950623 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 9,10 * the whole document * |