EP1041379 - Apparatus and method for detecting defects in the surface of a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADE Optical Systems Corporation 9625 Southern Pine Boulevard Charlotte NorthCarolina 28273 / US | [2006/34] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states ADE Optical Systems Corporation 9625 Southern Pine Boulevard Charlotte, NorthCarolina 28273 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bills, Richard Earl 9701 E Paseo del Tornasol Tueson, Arizona 85747 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302745.5 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | US19990127144P | 31.03.1999 Original published format: US 127144 P | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041379 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041379 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041379 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/95 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
G01N21/9501 (EP,US);
G06V10/421 (EP,US);
G06V10/98 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/33] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Detektion von Fehlern auf der Oberfläche eines Werkstücks | [2000/40] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting defects in the surface of a workpiece | [2000/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de détection de défauts de surface d'une pièce | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 12.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.08.2006 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4400868 (JENOPTIK JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,18 * column 1, line 34 - line 65 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 6 ** column 4, line 33 - line 41; figure 2 *; | [X]US5864394 (JORDAN III JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * column 1, line 33 - line 40 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 34 * * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 31 * * column 10, line 26 - column 11, line 38 * * column 15, line 45 - column 16, line 49 * * column 16, line 62 - column 17, line 8 * * column 18, line 63 - column 19, line 28 * * column 20, line 6 - line 30 * * column 21, line 44 - line 52 * * figures 1-5 * |