EP1044720 - Method and apparatus for sanitary mixing of viscous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MENTOR CORPORATION 5425 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states MENTOR CORPORATION 5425 Holister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodgers, Kenneth W. 2825 Wennington Drive Flower Mound, TX 75028 / US | 02 /
Strong, Gary D. 3412 Andover Drive Bedford, TX 76021 / US | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303057.4 | 11.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | US19990291928 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 291928 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044720 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/10, B01F15/02, B01F3/10, B29C31/04, B29C31/06, A61F2/02 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B01F23/47 (EP,US);
B01F27/80 (EP,US);
B01F35/715 (EP,US);
B01F35/754251 (EP,US);
B01F2035/351 (EP,US);
B01F27/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum sanitären Mischen von viskosem Material | [2000/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for sanitary mixing of viscous material | [2000/42] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la mélange sanitaire d'une matière visqueuse | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 29.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02122819 ; | [A]US4952065 (KREUZIGER WOLF-DIETER [AT]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, lines 54-63; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0895785 (MENTOR CORP [US]) [A] 11* abstract *; | [XP]EP0978361 (MENTOR CORP [US]) [XP] 19,20 * figure 1; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900718), vol. 014, no. 334, Database accession no. (C - 0742), & JP02122819 A 19900510 (TORAY DOW CORNING SILICONE CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |