EP1044823 - Ink jet recording sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohbayashi, Keiji c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Yoichi c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshitsuka, Kenichi c/o Konica Corporation, 28 Horinouchi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/42] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303073.1 | 12.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | JP19990105318 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10531899 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1044823 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1044823 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044823 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [2000/42] | English: | Ink jet recording sheet | [2000/42] | French: | Feuille pour l'impression par jet d'encre | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0495617 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * * example - ** table 3 *; | [X]EP0800930 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,10 * example A4 * * table A1 *; | [A]EP0890447 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claims 2,3 * |