EP1047063 - Data retrieval [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morling, Robert Philip 17 Cransley Cresceni Henleazo, Bristol BS9 4PH / GB | 02 /
Barndt, Richard David 4020 Heron Place Fremont, California CA94555 / US | 03 /
Williams, Christopher Huw Celn Coed, Well Lane, Devaudon Chepstow, South Wales NP6 6NX / GB | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Marsh, David John Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Marsh, David John Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/37] | Marsh, David John Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/43] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303222.4 | 17.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | EP19990302947 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: EP 99302947 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047063 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, H03M13/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G11B20/10009 (EP);
H04L25/4908 (EP);
G11B2020/1457 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/29] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Datenwiedergabe | [2000/43] | English: | Data retrieval | [2000/43] | French: | Reproduction de données | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 06.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/18] | 14.12.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2001 | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10154943 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 1 - page 7, line L; figures 1-8 *; | [L]US5910969 (SAYINER NECIP [US], et al) [L] 1-17 * column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 27; figures 1-9; claims 1-11 *; | [DA]WO9515551 (HEWLETT PACKARD LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1,16 * page 4, line 1 - page 10, line 13; figures 2,3 *; | [Y] - J. FITZPATRICK AND J.K. WOLF, "Partial Response Class I Signaling Applied to High Density Magnetic Recording", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, New York, USA, (19931129), pages 1950 - 1954, XP000436147 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * | [DA] - "ECMA: "3,81 MM WIDE MAGNETIC TAPE CARTRIDGE FOR INFORMATION INTERCHANGE - HELICAL SCAN RECORDING- DDS-3 FORMAT USING 125 M LENGTH TAPES", ECMA-236, (199606), page 83, XP002114950 [DA] 14 * page 83, line 1 - line L * | [A] - P.H. SIEGEL AND J.K. WOLF, "Modulation and Coding for Information Storage", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, New York, US, (199112), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 68 - 86, XP000287983 [A] 1,16,17 * page 76, column 1, line 30 - page 79, column 2, line 6; figure 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.120353 |