EP1108410 - A liftable side rail assembly for a bed or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARAMOUNT BED COMPANY LIMITED 14-5, Higashi Suna 2-chome Koto-ward Tokyo / JP | [2006/32] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states PARAMOUNT BED COMPANY LIMITED 14-5, Higashi Suna 2-chome Koto-ward, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanahara, Kenji 11-17 Oana Minami 1-chome Funabashi City, Chiba Pref. / JP | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Bryer, Kenneth Robert, et al Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Bryer, Kenneth Robert, et al K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303237.2 | 17.04.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | JP19990353181 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35318199 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1108410 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1108410 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108410 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A47C21/08 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/05 (EP,US);
A61G7/0509 (EP,US);
A61G7/0513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/25] | Title | German: | Hebbare Seitenlehne für Betten oder dergleichen | [2001/25] | English: | A liftable side rail assembly for a bed or the like | [2001/25] | French: | Barrière relevable pour lit ou similaire | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2006 | BE | 09.08.2006 | CH | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | IT | 09.08.2006 | LI | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | ES | 20.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | IE | 17.04.2007 | LU | 17.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
LI | 09.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05199927 ; | [A]WO9960893 (HILL ROM CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 25 - line 30; figure - *; | [A]DE8529108U (L & C ARNOLD. GMBH.); | [A]DE29705820U (KOETTER HELMUT [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931126), vol. 017, no. 638, Database accession no. (C - 1133), & JP05199927 A 19930810 (PARAMOUNT BED CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |