EP1051019 - Unified alerting method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cloutier, Jocelyn 770, 18th Avenue, Menlo Park San Mateo County, California 94025 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303419.6 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | US19990303517 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: US 303517 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051019 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/02, H04M11/04, H04Q7/22 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W68/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einheitliche Warn-Verfahren und Einrichtung | [2000/45] | English: | Unified alerting method and apparatus | [2000/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'alerte unifié | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |