EP1111818 - Method for adjusting the power of a WDM optical signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/26] | Method and apparatus for adjusting the power in an optical signal | ||
[2009/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wan, Ping Wai 84 Kimbolton Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2K 2S4 / CA | 02 /
Remedios, Derrick Anthony John 30 Wellfleet Crescent Nepean, Ontario K2J 2Y2 / CA | 03 /
Liu, Kexing 263 Monterey Drive Nepean, Ontario K2H 7B1 / CA | 04 /
Adolph, Stephen Kieran 456 Athlone Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 5M8 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303596.1 | 28.04.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19990467776 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: US 467776 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111818 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111818 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111818 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17, H04J14/02 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H04B10/2941 (EP,US);
H04B10/2972 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/47] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausgleichen der Leistung in einem optischen WDM Signal | [2009/02] | English: | Method for adjusting the power of a WDM optical signal | [2009/02] | French: | Procédé d'égalisation de la puissance d'un signal optique WDM | [2009/02] |
Former [2001/26] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausgleichen der Leistung in einem optischen WDM Signal | ||
Former [2001/26] | Method and apparatus for adjusting the power in an optical signal | ||
Former [2001/26] | Procédé et dispositif d'égalisation de la puissance d'un signal optique WDM | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2008 | 02.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0959577 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9,16,21,22,24,25 * column 24, paragraph 124 - column 27, paragraph 137 * * figures 23-25 *; | [X]EP0918405 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,7-9,16,21,22,24,25 * column 2, paragraph 13 - column 3, paragraph 15 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5933270 (TOYOHARA ATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9,12,13,16,21,22,24,25 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 30 * * figures 1,7,11 * | Examination | EP0734129 | EP0964275 | EP0892512 | WO9805133 |