EP1050905 - Method of producing a semiconductor device with insulating layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/45] | Semiconductor device with insulating layer | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2017/21] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Daisuke, @Shinko Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | 02 /
Kitahara, Yuichi, @Shinko Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2017/20] |
Former [2000/45] | 01 /
Ito, Daisuke, Shinko Electric Industrie Co., Ltd. 711 Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | ||
02 /
Kitahara, Yuichi, Sh Electric Industrie Co., Ltd. 711 Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/25] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/45] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303721.5 | 03.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | JP19990127120 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12712099 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050905 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050905 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050905 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/31, H01L21/768, H01L21/60 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H01L24/12 (EP,US);
H01L21/76814 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/32135 (KR);
H01L21/32139 (KR);
H01L21/76883 (KR);
H01L23/3114 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/0231 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05624 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11334 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48624 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48647 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01007 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01018 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/04042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48624, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2001/37] | H01L21/768, H01L21/60 | ||
Former IPC [2000/45] | H01L21/768 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2017/25] |
Former [2002/23] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleitervorrichtung mit isolierender Schicht | [2016/51] | English: | Method of producing a semiconductor device with insulating layer | [2016/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur avec couche isolante | [2016/51] |
Former [2000/45] | Halbleitervorrichtung mit isolierender Schicht | ||
Former [2000/45] | Semiconductor device with insulating layer | ||
Former [2000/45] | Dispositif semiconducteur avec couche isolante | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1167702 ; | [A]JPS6187338 ; | [A]US4278493 (PETVAI STEVE I) [A] 1-11* column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US4357203 (ZELEZ JOSEPH) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [A]DE19627017 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 41 - line 66 * * column 8, line 61 - column 10, line 48 * * column 13, line 48 - column 15, line 15; figure 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11067702 A 19990309 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860904), vol. 010, no. 259, Database accession no. (E - 434), & JP61087338 A 19860502 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | JPH02246246 | by applicant | US4357203 |