EP1054564 - Bidirectional communication system and method. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/47] | Receiving apparatus and method, broadcasting apparatus and method, information processing apparatus and method, biderectional communication system and method, and providing media | ||
[2009/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murahashi, Hideki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sai, Kairi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Cho, Shi-hyong c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2000/47] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304182.9 | 17.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | JP19990136694 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13669499 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1054564 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1054564 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054564 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/16, H04N5/445 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4332 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4756 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | H04N7/173, H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bidirectionales Übertragungssystem und -verfahren. | [2009/51] | English: | Bidirectional communication system and method. | [2010/21] | French: | Système et procédé de communication bidirectionnel. | [2009/51] |
Former [2000/47] | Empfangsvorrichtung und -verfahren , Rundfunkvorrichtung und -verfahren , Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und -verfahren , bidirectionales Übertragungssystem und -verfahren , und Medium zur Bereitstellung | ||
Former [2000/47] | Receiving apparatus and method, broadcasting apparatus and method, information processing apparatus and method, biderectional communication system and method, and providing media | ||
Former [2000/47] | Appareil et procédé de réception , appareil et procédé pour la radio diffusion , appareil et procédé de traitement d'information , système et procédé de communication bidirectionnel, et moyen de support | Examination procedure | 28.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10168066.8 / EP2230847 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9415417 (MINIMETRICS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,9-15 * the whole document * [A] 2,6-8; | [YA]US5758259 (LAWLER FRANK A [US]) [Y] 1,3-5,9-15 * the whole document * [A] 2,6-8; | [A]US5828419 (BRUETTE JEFF [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 22 *; | [A]WO9316443 (ADVANCED PROMOTION TECH [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 1 - page 17, line 23 *; | [A]US5561811 (BIER ERIC A [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 26 *; | [A]US5717814 (ABECASSIS MAX [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 13 - line 67 *; | [A]WO9820678 (GATEWAY 2000 INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |