EP1092735 - Process for manufacturing high 1,4-CIS polybutadiene containing hydroxyl groups at ends thereof using molecular oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co. Ltd. No. 70, Seorin-dong, Chongno-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co. Ltd. No. 70, Seorin-dong, Chongno-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwag, Gwang Hoon Samsung Hanul Apt.,No.102-206 Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-390 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung Hwon Expo Apt.,No. 301-1001, Jenmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon-city 305-395 / KR | 03 /
Kim, A Ju Daerim Doore Apt.,No.101-205 Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-345 / KR | 04 /
Jang, Young Chan Samsung Hanul Apt.,No.102-1304 Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-390 / KR | 05 /
Lee, Seung Hwon Daerim Doore Apt.,No.102-205 Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-345 / KR | [2011/46] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
Kwag, Gwang Hoon Samsung Hanul Apt.,No.102-206, Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Seung Hwon Expo Apt.,No. 301-1001, Jenmin-dong, Yusung-ku Taejon-city 305-395 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, A Ju Daerim Doore Apt.,No.101-205, Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-345 / KR | |||
04 /
Jang, Young Chan Samsung Hanul Apt.,No.102-1304, Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-390 / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Seung Hwon Daerim Doore Apt.,No.102-205, Shinsung-dong Yusung-ku, Taejon-city 305-345 / KR | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2001/16] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304407.0 | 24.05.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | KR19990044233 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9944233 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092735 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092735 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F236/06, C08C19/44, C08F4/54, C08F4/64, C08F4/70 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C08F236/06 (EP,KR);
C08C19/44 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/06, C08F4/545 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F4/6421 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F4/7096 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F4/7098 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxyl-Endgruppen enthaltenden 1,4-cis Polybutadien mit molekularem Sauerstoff | [2001/16] | English: | Process for manufacturing high 1,4-CIS polybutadiene containing hydroxyl groups at ends thereof using molecular oxygen | [2001/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication du 1,4-cis polybutadiène contenant des groupements hydroxyls en fin de chaine par utilisation d'oxygène moléculaire | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2011 | 22.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2003 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | GB | 24.05.2012 | IE | 24.05.2012 | LU | 24.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 24.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 24.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 24.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 16.11.2011 | |
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1008606 (SNAM SPA) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 71 - page 2, line 26 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0093075 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,11-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 27 - line 36 * * page 12, line 4 - line 27 * * examples 1-3 ** claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0770631 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,6-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 18 * * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US5708092 (SCHWINDEMAN JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 1,18-23,26,27 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 24 * * column 5, line 32 - line 35 * * column 6, line 5 - line 30 * * claims 18-20 *; | [Y]EP0920886 (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,18-23,26,27 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - line 54 * * page 6, line 21 - line 56 * * table 1 * * claims 1-5 * | by applicant | BE551851 | JPS4021265B | JPS378198B | BE573680 | JPS4918635 | US4906706 | JPH04122709 | EP0713886 | JPH1036418 | JPH10182726 |