EP1058156 - Integrating waveguide for use in lithographic projection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banine, Vadim Yevgenyevich Nierslaan 2 5704 NK Helmond / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Slenders, Petrus Johannes Waltherus, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Slenders, Petrus J. W., et al ASML Netherlands B.V Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/49] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304664.6 | 01.06.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | EP19990201768 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99201768 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1058156 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1058156 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
G03F7/70075 (EP);
G03F7/70166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/12] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierender Wellenleiter zur Verwendung in einem lithographischen Projektionsapparat | [2000/49] | English: | Integrating waveguide for use in lithographic projection apparatus | [2000/49] | French: | Guide intégrateur d' ondes pour l' utilisation dans un appareil de projection lithographique | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 18.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5175755 (KUMAKHOV MURADIN A [SU]) [X] 1-4,6-18 * see parent application published as US 5 192 869 A; column 4, line 61 - line 63 * * column 6, line 10 - line 15 * * column 6, line 28 - line 58 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US5192869 (KUMAKHOV MURADIN A [SU]) [A] 1-4,6-18 * publication of parent application of US 5 175 755 A * * abstract * * column 11, line 49 - line 57 * * column 14, line 45 - line 63 * * column 16, line 36 - line 43 *; | [X]US5276724 (KUMASAKA FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-18 * abstract *; | [X]US5812631 (YAN YIMING [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,6-18 * abstract * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 16 * * figure 18 *; | [X]WO9852389 (CYMER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15-18 * abstract * * page 7, line 21 - line 22 *; | [PX]WO9942904 (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL], et al) [PX] 1,2,16-18 * abstract ** page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 3 *; | [X] - "COLLIMATOR FOR X-RAY LITHOGRAPHY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19900901), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 278 - 279, XP000106428 [X] 1-4,15-18 * the whole document * |