EP1065498 - Method for determining optical quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/01] | Method and apparatus for determining optical quality | ||
[2006/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2006/50] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladewski, Theodore B. 305, Wesley Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heat, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304747.9 | 05.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | US19990332236 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: US 332236 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065498 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065498 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065498 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/896, G01N21/95, G01N21/45 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G01N21/958 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8832 (EP,US);
G01N2021/9586 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | G01N21/896, G01N21/95 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der optischen Qualität | [2006/29] | English: | Method for determining optical quality | [2006/29] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination de la qualité | [2006/29] |
Former [2001/01] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der optischen Qualität | ||
Former [2001/01] | Method and apparatus for determining optical quality | ||
Former [2001/01] | Procédé et appareil pour la détermination de la qualité | Examination procedure | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2006 | 12.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 14.03.2007 | [2007/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4647197 (KITAYA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5128550 (ERBECK RALF [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 20 - line 55 *; | [A]US5307151 (HOF ALBRECHT [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* columns 3-4; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5343288 (COHEN BRIAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * columns 3-4; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9612160 (MOORE JOHN HUMPHREY [GB]) [A] 1-9 * pages 17-19; figure 1; claim 1 * * pages 28-29 *; | [A]WO9627115 (ZEIEN ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-9 * pages 6-9; figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5612786 (HUBER EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * columns 2-4; figure 3; claim 1 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 15 *; | [A]US5636025 (BIEMAN LEONARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * columns 5-9; figures 6-8; claim 1 * |