EP1059621 - Light transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLEBRAND LIMITED Colebrand House 20 Warwick Street Regent Street London, W1R 6BE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states COLEBRAND LIMITED Colebrand House 20 Warwick Street Regent Street London, W1R 6BE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tusch, Klaus Norbert 34 Wilton Crescent London SW1 8RX / GB | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/50] | Foster, Mark Charles Edward Evans & Co., Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304883.2 | 08.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | GB19990013427 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9913427 | GB19990016795 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916795 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059621 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08B15/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
G08B13/19619 (EP);
G08B15/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] |
Former [2001/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtsender | [2000/50] | English: | Light transmitter | [2000/50] | French: | Transmetteur de lumière | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 31.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.08.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.08.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59104868 ; | [Y]EP0230671 (CAMPS ROBERT [FR], et al) [Y] 8-15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0435007 (EMO ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-15 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841009), vol. 008, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 271), & JP59104868 A 19840616 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |