EP1063764 - Regulator with alternator output current and input drive power control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.E. NIEHOFF & COMPANY 2021 Lee Street Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | [2008/26] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states C.E. NIEHOFF & COMPANY 2021 Lee Street Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, James 30 Elmhurst Avenue Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | 02 /
Jabaji, Issam 7646 Church Street Morton Grove, Illinois 60053 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305244.6 | 21.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | US19990338320 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: US 338320 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063764 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063764 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063764 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/10, H02P9/30 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
H02P9/48 (EP,US);
H02P9/30 (EP,US);
H02P9/305 (EP,US);
H02P2101/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | H02P9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | Regelung mit Generatorausgangsstrom- und Eingangsantriebsleistungsregelung | [2000/52] | English: | Regulator with alternator output current and input drive power control | [2000/52] | French: | Régulateur avec contrôle du courant de sortie d'un alternateur et de la puissance d'entrée | [2007/51] |
Former [2000/52] | Régulateur avec contrôle du courant de sortie d' un alternateur et de la puissance d'entrée | Examination procedure | 19.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP06018348.0 / EP1742346 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.06.2008 | DK | 25.06.2008 | FI | 25.06.2008 | PT | 25.11.2008 | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/20] | DK | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 25.06.2008 | |
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 25.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5256959 (NAGANO MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* column 7, line 63 - column 9, line 32 *; | [X]US5270575 (TOGAI KAZUHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,16,17 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 35 * * column 8, line 44 - line 54 * |