EP1167454 - A polymer dispersion comprising particles of polyurethane and a copolymer or terpolymer produced by emulsion polymerization of olefinically unsaturated monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faust, Hans Uwe Eckener Strasse 4 52078 Aachen Brand / DE | 02 /
McLennan, Alistair John Hoolstraat 54 Beek (L) NL 6191 TZ / NL | 03 /
Schofield, Kevin 5 St. Wilfrid's Drive Grappenhall Warrington, Cheshire WA4 2SH / GB | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
Faust, Hans Uwe Eckener Strasse 4 52078 Aachen Brand / DE | ||
02 /
McLennan, Alistair John 126 Sandy Lane South Wallington Surrey SM6 9NR / GB | |||
03 /
Schofield, Kevin 5 St. Wilfrid's Drive Grappenhall Warrington, Cheshire WA4 2SH / GB | Representative(s) | Wiesenhaan, Herman Looermark 1 7437 SH Bathmen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Wiesenhaan, Herman, Drs. Looermark 1 7437 SH Bathmen / NL | Application number, filing date | 00305342.8 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167454 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167454 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L75/04, C08F283/00, C08G18/10 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/0866 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3231 (EP,US);
C08L75/04, C08L33/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | Polymerdispersion enthaltend PU-Partikel und durch Emulsionspolymerisation olefinisch ungesättigter Monomerer erhaltenes Co- oder Terpolymer | [2002/01] | English: | A polymer dispersion comprising particles of polyurethane and a copolymer or terpolymer produced by emulsion polymerization of olefinically unsaturated monomers | [2002/01] | French: | Dispersion de polymère comprénant particules de polyuréthane et un co- ou terpolymère produit par polymérisation en emulsion de monomères insaturés | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.01.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Request for further processing for: | 27.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | DK | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | CY | 23.06.2003 | IE | 23.06.2003 | LU | 23.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 23.06.2003 | ||
IE | 23.06.2003 | ||
LU | 23.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 23.06.2003 | ||
IE | 23.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 23.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 04.03.2003 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0309113 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) [DA] 1-3,5,8,15* page 6, line 9 - line 15; examples 1,6; claims 1,11-13 *; | [A]EP0705855 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-5,7,8,15 * page 5, line 4 - line 9; examples 3,4; claims 20,23 *; | [A]EP0933412 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,14,15 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 35; example II; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US6063861 (IRLE CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8,15 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 11; example -; claims 1-5 * |