EP1067704 - Method for controlling power for a communications system having multiple traffic channels per subscriber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamel, Raafat Edward 107 Francisco Avenue Little Falls New Jersey 7424 / US | 02 /
Kuo, Wen-Yi 107 Rolling Hill Drive, Morganville Monmouth NJ 07751 / US | 03 /
Meyers, Martin Howard 93 Cooper Avenue Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US | 04 /
Weaver, Carl Francis 16 Edwin Road Township of Hanover, New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
Wu, Xiao Cheng 899 Sunset Ridge Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
Kamel, Raafat Edward 559 North Avenue East Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | ||
02 /
Kuo, Wen-Yi 107 Rolling Hill Drive, Morganville Monmouth NJ 07751 / US | |||
03 /
Meyers, Martin Howard 93 Cooper Avenue Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US | |||
04 /
Weaver, Carl Francis 16 Edwin Road Township of Hanover, New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
05 /
Wu, Xiao Cheng 899 Sunset Ridge Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
Former [2001/03] | 01 /
Kamel, Raafat Edward 559 North Avenue East Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | ||
02 /
Kuo, Wen-Yi 107 Rolling Hill Drive, Morganville Monmouth NJ 07751 / US | |||
03 /
Meyers, Martin Howard 93 Cooper Avenue Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US | |||
04 /
Weaver, Carl Francis 16 Edwin Road Township of Hanover, New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
05 /
Wu, Xiao Cheng 1480 Route 46, Apt. 198B Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | |||
Former [2001/02] | 01 /
Kamel, Raafat Edward 559 North Avenue East Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | ||
02 /
Kuo, Wen-Yi 16 Doric Avenue Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | |||
03 /
Meyers, Martin Howard 93 Cooper Avenue Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US | |||
04 /
Weaver, Carl Francis 16 Edwin Road Township of Hanover, New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
05 /
Wu, Xiao Cheng 1480 Route 46, Apt. 198B Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2012/19] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2012/14] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/02] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305395.6 | 27.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | US19990349238 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: US 349238 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067704 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067704 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067704 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/28, H04W52/26 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04W52/265 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04W52/283 (EP,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | H04W52/04 | ||
Former IPC [2001/02] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/48] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sendeleistungsregelungsverfahren für ein Kommunikationssystem mit mehreren Verkehrskanälen pro Teilnehmer | [2001/02] | English: | Method for controlling power for a communications system having multiple traffic channels per subscriber | [2001/02] | French: | Méthode de commande de puissance pour un système de communication avec plusieurs canaux de traffic pour abonné | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 10.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, SE | 16.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2005 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | DE FI FR GB SE | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5216692 (LING FUYUN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-7 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO9836606 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * claims 1,3-7 *; | [A]US5832387 (BAE HEE-MOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 * * claims 1,5,8 *; | [X]WO9858461 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-15 * * page 4 - page 5 * * page 6, line 1 - line 11 *; | [E]US6690944 (LEE WOOKWON [CA], et al) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 ** claims 1,5,8,10 * |