EP1064883 - Foam buttress for stapling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamilton, Leslie 23 High Mowing Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 02 /
Bezwada, Rao S. 1 Nevius Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | 03 /
Roller, Mark B. 9 Quince Place North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 04 /
Vyakarnam, Murty N. 529 West 111th Street, Apt. 42 New-York, NY 10025 / US | 05 /
Dalessandro, David A. 59 Helen Street Fanwood, NJ 07023 / US | 06 /
Rosenblatt, Joel S. 47 Robin Glen Road Watchung, NJ 07060 / US | 07 /
Kataria, Ram L. 16 Hoffman Drive Hamilton Square, NJ 08690 / US | 08 /
Saferstein, Lowell G. 14 Currey Lane West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | 09 /
Martin, James F. 527 Quail Court Lebanon, OH 45036 / US | [2001/02] |
Former [2001/01] | 01 /
Hamilton, Leslie 23 High Mowing Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | ||
02 /
Bezwada, Rao S. 1 Nevius Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | |||
03 /
Roller, Mark B. 9 Quince Place North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | |||
04 /
Vyakarnam, Murty N. 529 West 111th Street, Apt. 42 New-York, NJ 10025-1942 / US | |||
05 /
Dalessandro, David A. 59 Helen Street Fanwood, NJ 07023 / US | |||
06 /
Rosenblatt, Joel S. 47 Robin Glen Road Watchung, NJ 07060 / US | |||
07 /
Kataria, Ram L. 16 Hoffman Drive Hamilton Square, NJ 08690 / US | |||
08 /
Saferstein, Lowell G. 14 Currey Lane West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | |||
09 /
Martin, James F. 527 Quail Court Lebanon, OH 45036 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305509.2 | 29.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | US19990345093 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: US 345093 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064883 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064883 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/38] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aus Schaumstoff bestehende Versteifung für ein chirurgisches Klammergerät | [2001/01] | English: | Foam buttress for stapling apparatus | [2001/01] | French: | Pièce d'appui en mousse pour agrafeuse chirurgicale | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0577373 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1,18* abstract *; | [XY]EP0594148 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,12,17 * the whole document * [Y] 13,18,20,21; | [Y]US5441193 (GRAVENER ROY D [US]) [Y] 13,18,20,21 * abstract * * column 2, lines 44-57 * * column 3, lines 23-63 *; | [A]EP0922435 (IGAKI IRYO SEKKEI KK [JP]) [A] 1,18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4633861 | US4892244 | US5263629 | EP0464163 | US5468253 | US5503638 | US5702409 | US5766188 |