EP1086692 - Estrogen agonists and antagonists for multiple indications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Li Julia Pfizer Central Research, Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al Pfizer Limited European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305611.6 | 03.07.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | US19990146072P | 28.07.1999 Original published format: US 146072 P | US19990146075P | 28.07.1999 Original published format: US 146075 P | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1086692 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1086692 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/138, A61K31/40, A61K31/37, A61P19/10, A61P9/00, A61P35/00 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | A61K31/40, A61K31/35, A61K31/135, A61P19/10, A61P9/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | Oestrogen Agonisten und Antagonisten für mehrere Indikationen | [2001/13] | English: | Estrogen agonists and antagonists for multiple indications | [2001/13] | French: | Agonistes et antagonistes de l'estrogène pour des indications multiples | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 10.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5552412 (CAMERON KIMBERLY O [US], et al) [YD] 3 * abstract * * example 2 * * example 8 * * column 32; claims 1,6-9 *; | [XY] - "nablaRaloxifene to prevent postmenopausal osteoporosis", DRUG AND THERAPEUTICS BULLETIN 1999 UNITED KINGDOM, (1999), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0012-6543, pages 33 - 36, XP008016682 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 33, column L, lines 8,9 * * page 33, column R, lines 28-33 * * page 34, column L, lines 1-46 * * page 34, column R, lines 7-28 * * page 34, column R, lines 36-46 * * page 35, column L, lines 16-19 * * pages 33-35 * [Y] 2,3 | [X] - SKERJANEC ANDREJ ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics and pharmacodynamic interaction study between raloxifene and warfarin.", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH (NEW YORK), Annual Meeting of the American Association of Pharmaceutical Scientists;Boston, Massachusetts, USA; November 2-6, 1997, (199711), vol. 14, no. 11 SUPPL., ISSN 0724-8741, pages S561 - S562, XP008016675 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - GRASSER W A ET AL, "COMMON MECHANISM FOR THE ESTROGEN AGONIST AND ANTAGONIST ACTIVITIES OF DROLOXIFENE", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, WILEY-LISS INC, US, (1997), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 159 - 171, XP000971988 [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 160, column L, lines 21-23 * * page 160, column R, lines 1-19 * * page 170 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4644(199705)65:2<159::AID-JCB3>3.0.CO;2-T | [Y] - IBRAHIM N K ET AL, "NEW ANTIESTROGENS IN BREAST CANCER: A REVIEW", BREAST JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE,, US, (1998), vol. 4, no. 4, ISSN 1075-122X, pages 213 - 229, XP000913579 [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 215; figure 1 * * page 217 - page 219 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1524-4741.1998.440213.x | [A] - DELMAS PIERRE D ET AL, "Effects of raloxifene on bone mineral density, serum cholesterol concentrations, and uterine endometrium in postmenopausal women.", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (19971204), vol. 337, no. 23, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1641 - 1647, XP008016674 [A] 1-3 * page 1641, column R, lines 12-28 * * page 1642 - page 1645 * * page 1646, column L, lines 18-21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199712043372301 | [XP] - GOLDSTEIN S R, "Selective estrogen receptor modulators: A new category of compounds to extend postmenopausal women's health", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FERTILITY AND WOMEN'S MEDICINE 1999 UNITED STATES, (199909), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 1069-3130, pages 221 - 226, XP008016605 [XP] 1,2 * abstract * * page 222, column R, lines 17-47 * * page 223, column L, lines 1-30 * * page 223, column R, lines 29-51 * * page 224, column L, lines 15-18 * * page 224, column L, lines 23-34 * * page 225, column R, line 5 * * page 225, column L, lines 20-25 * | [XP] - LIEN E A ET AL, "Selective oestrogen receptor modifiers (SERMs) and breast cancer therapy.", CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, (200006), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0305-7372, pages 205 - 227, XP008016604 [XP] 1,2 * page 205, column R, lines 14-17 * * page 206, column R, lines 11,12 * * page 206, column R, lines 16-18 * * figure 1 * * page 208, column R, lines 1-20 * * page 214 - page 218 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/ctrv.1999.0162 | [XP] - SCOTT J A ET AL, "Raloxifene: a selective estrogen receptor modulator.", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN. UNITED STATES 15 SEP 1999, (19990915), vol. 60, no. 4, ISSN 0002-838X, pages 1131 - 1139, XP008016687 [XP] 1,2 * abstract * * page TITLE * * page 1132, column L, line 1 * * page 1132, column L, line 5 * * page 1132, column L, lines 8,9 * * page 1132, column R, lines 42-44 * * page 1133 - page 1134 * * tables 1,2 * | [AP] - UMLAND ELENA M ET AL, "The impact of estrogen replacement therapy and raloxifene on osteoporosis, cardiovascular disease, and gynecologic cancers.", ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, (199912), vol. 33, no. 12, ISSN 1060-0280, pages 1315 - 1328, XP008016689 [AP] 1-3 * page 1322 - page 1324 * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1345/aph.18463 |