EP1067076 - Coat film transfer head device and coat film transfer tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEED RUBBER COMPANY LTD. 3-5-25, Uchindai-cho, Miyakojima-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamai, Shigeru 2-1-33, Asahigaoka Ikeda-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Koyama, Kouhei 6-303, Kudocho, Matsugasaki, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Shintani, Masatoshi 8-1-8, Mukogaoka Sanda-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Mounteney, Simon James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305719.7 | 06.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | JP19990192409 | 06.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19240999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067076 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067076 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067076 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H37/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B65H37/007 (EP,US);
B43L19/00 (KR);
B65H2301/33 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1795 (EP,US);
Y10T156/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/38] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Auftragkopf für einen Beschichtungsfilm und Übertragungswerkzeug für Beschichtungsfilm | [2001/02] | English: | Coat film transfer head device and coat film transfer tool | [2001/02] | French: | Tête de transfert pour un film de revêtement et outil de transfert de film de revêtement | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0656308 (SEED RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 9, line 34 - column 13, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US5792263 (KOYAMA KOUHEI [JP], et al) [A] 11* column 6, line 26 - column 9, line 48; figure 1 * |