EP1071220 - Multipath noise reducer, audio output circuit, and FM receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuji, Masayuki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Asano, Eji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Tsujishita, Masahiro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
Taura, Kenichi, c/o Mitsubsihi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 10-8310 / JP | 05 /
Ishida, Masayuki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/04] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann R G C Jenkins, 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306163.7 | 19.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | JP19990207422 | 22.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20742299 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071220 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1071220 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071220 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H04B1/10 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
H04B1/1669 (EP,US);
H04B1/1081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrwegstörungsreduktionsschaltung und Audioausgangsschaltung eines FM-Empfängers | [2001/04] | English: | Multipath noise reducer, audio output circuit, and FM receiver | [2001/04] | French: | Circuit de réduction de bruits multivoies , circuit de sortie audio , et récepteur à modulation de fréquence | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3979679 (BUSH JOHN A, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 54 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0274157 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 23 - column 8, line 51 ** figure 1 *; | [XA]US4879729 (SALEMBIER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 55 * * figure 3 * [A] 4,5,8-10; | [A]US5390344 (NAGATA YUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 43 - column 9, line 10 * * figure 1 * |