EP1076142 - Door lock assembly with detachable operating handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKIGEN MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 24-4, Nishigotanda 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states TAKIGEN MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 24-4, Nishigotanda 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirou, Segawa, c/o Takigen Manufacturing Co., Ltd 24-4 Nishigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306181.9 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | JP19990228927 | 12.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22892799 | JP19990327362 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32736299 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076142 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076142 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05C3/04, E05B35/00, E05B17/18 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
E05B17/18 (EP);
E05B35/008 (EP);
E05C3/042 (EP);
E05B15/006 (EP);
E05B17/2038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | Türschlossvorrichtung mit abnehmbarem Betätigungsgriff | [2001/07] | English: | Door lock assembly with detachable operating handle | [2001/07] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage de porte avec poignée d'actionnement démontable | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2004 | BE | 14.04.2004 | CH | 14.04.2004 | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | LI | 14.04.2004 | NL | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | IE | 20.07.2004 | LU | 20.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
CY | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 20.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 20.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 20.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
LI | 14.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3907348 (BATES WAYNE C, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 39; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5412960 (JAMES BRENT A [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 7 - line 22; figures 3,4,6,10,11 * | by applicant | JP2820660B |