EP1072930 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriwaki, Hiroyuki Maison Wakakusa 105, 3-4, Kawakubo-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Mitsuhiro Raporu Nara 315, 763-1, Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
Moriwaki, Hiroyuki Maison Wakakusa 105, Kawakubo-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Mitsuhiro Raporu Nara 315, 763-1, Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara / JP | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306198.3 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | JP19990206732 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20673299 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1072930 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1072930 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072930 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, G02F1/139 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
G02F1/1397 (EP,US);
G02F1/133638 (EP,US);
G02F2203/02 (EP,US);
G02F2413/02 (EP,US);
G02F2413/08 (EP,US);
G02F2413/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [2003/33] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [2001/05] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [2001/05] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.12.2005 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5619356 (KOZO NAKAMURA [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [Y]US5920367 (KAJIMOTO KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13* column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 28 * |