EP1075087 - Variable length coding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Kook-yeol, Samsung Electronics Col, Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Byung-sun, Samsung Electronics Col, Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Yung-lyul, Samsung Electronics Col, Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306429.2 | 27.07.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | KR19990031672 | 02.08.1999 Original published format: KR 9931672 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1075087 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1075087 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075087 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/42, H04N7/50, H04N5/14 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
H03M7/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/91 (KR);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/179 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Codierung mit variabler Länge | [2001/06] | English: | Variable length coding method and apparatus | [2001/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de codage à longueur variable | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2005 | BE | 19.10.2005 | CH | 19.10.2005 | CY | 19.10.2005 | LI | 19.10.2005 | DK | 19.01.2006 | GR | 19.01.2006 | SE | 19.01.2006 | ES | 30.01.2006 | PT | 20.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/45] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 19.10.2005 | |
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 19.01.2006 | |
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | PT | 20.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0426429 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,10,19-22 * page 2, line 1 - line 55 * * the whole document * [A] 2-9,11-18,23; | [A]EP0490537 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0616471 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10,20,21 * column 9, line 35 - column 11, line 8 * * the whole document * [A] 2-9,11,19,22,23; | [A]US5541595 (MEYER EDWIN R [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |