EP1081335 - Stator assembly for a rotary machine and method for making the stator assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMahon, Michael E. 100 Norton Ridge Road Shapleigh, ME 04076 / US | 02 /
Richardson, Carl S. 205 Knights Pond Road South Berwick, ME / US | 03 /
Watson, Charles R. 60 Mary Catherine Circle Windsor, CT 06095 / US | 04 /
Tremblay, Dennis R. 5 Wilson Street Biddeford, ME 04005 / US | 05 /
Leshane, Jeffery S. 70 Conestoga Way Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306777.4 | 09.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990147978P | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 147978 P | US20000629307 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 629307 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081335 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081335 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081335 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D9/04, F01D5/26, F01D11/00, F01D11/08, F01D11/12 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F05C2225/08 (EP,US);
F05D2240/10 (EP,US);
F05D2300/431 (EP,US);
F05D2300/501 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | F01D5/30, F01D9/04, F01D5/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stator für eine Turbomaschine und Methode zu deren Fertigung | [2001/10] | English: | Stator assembly for a rotary machine and method for making the stator assembly | [2001/10] | French: | Stator pour une turbomachine et méthode pour la fabrication | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3843278 (TORELL S) [X] 11 * column 2, lines 21-35; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2404102 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-23* figure 1 *; | [X]US4349313 (MUNROE ALAN D, et al) [X] 11 * column 4, lines 25-30; figure 2 *; | [X]US5380155 (VARSIK DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11 * column 2, lines 42-47; figure 4 *; | [X]US5883314 (SIEVERS GEORGE K [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 12, line 62 - column 13, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [E]EP1079075 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 11 * figure 2 *; | [E]EP1111246 (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [E] 11 * column A; figure 3 * |