EP1081583 - Menu display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Yoshihiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujisawa, Naoki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ihara, Keigo c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kohno, Tetsuya c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Hasegawa, Tota c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Sakata, Junichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Tanaka, Tomoe c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Ooi, Junji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Morain, David, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Lindemann, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2012/34] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307275.8 | 23.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | JP19990246479 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24647999 | JP19990246480 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24648099 | JP19990246481 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24648199 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081583 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081583 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1679 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
G06F1/169 (EP,US);
G06F3/0362 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/13] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Menüanzeigesystem | [2001/10] | English: | Menu display system | [2001/10] | French: | Système d'affichage des menus | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | 21.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0623870 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-36* claims 1-6 *; | [X]US5485175 (SUZUKI YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 55 - line 67; claim 1 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 12; figures 2,2a *; | [X]EP0792056 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,8,13-15,19,25-27 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 2 * * column 8, line 10 - line 27 * * column 11, line 35 - column 12, line 52; claim 1 *; | [A]US5721853 (SMITH KIM C [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 52 * | Examination | US4660032 | EP0864963 | - "ISO 9241-12:1998 Ergonomic requirements for office work with visual display terminals (VDTs) -- Part 12: Presentation of information", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD - ISO, ZUERICH, CH, (19981201), vol. 9241, page 46p, XP001525161 | - "ISO 9241-16. Ergonomic requirements for office work with visual display terminals (VDTs) - Part 16: Direct manipulation dialogues = EXIGENCES ERGONOMIQUES POUR TRAVAIL DE BUREAU AVEC TERMINAUX A ECRANS DE VISUALISATION (TEV) - PARTIE 16: DIALOGUES DE TYPE MANIPULATION DIRECTE", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD - ISO, ZUERICH, CH, (19990901), vol. 9241-16, page 38pp, XP001525166 | by applicant | US5485175 | EP0792056 |