EP1081660 - Integrating light mixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 1301 Wilson Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2006/33] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states MARS, INCORPORATED 6885 Elm Street McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetherell William B 7 Stonehill Drive, Apt.5C, Stoneham Massachusetts 02180-3952 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307457.2 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990390125 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: US 390125 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081660 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081660 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081660 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/12, G02B27/09 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G02B27/123 (EP,US);
G07D7/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2004/29] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierender Lichtmischer | [2001/10] | English: | Integrating light mixer | [2001/10] | French: | Mélangeur pour l'intégration de lumière | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 03.11.2006 | [2007/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5491336 (CONCANNON DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * figures 1A,1C * * figures 2,3 * * column 1, lines 7-17 * * column 2, lines 12-20 * * column 4, lines 32-37 * * column 6, lines 61,62 * * column 7, lines 17-47 * * column 8, lines 64-67 * * column 9, lines 1-14 *; | [X]US5825945 (STOLIS PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * figures 9-12 * * column 2, lines 55-65 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 3 * * column 9, lines 20-50 *; | [A]GB2140571 (LEITZ ERNST GMBH) [A] * page 1, lines 105-128 *; | [A]DE19713385 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |