EP1122018 - Unterwater processing device and underwater processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obana, Takeshi, Hitachi Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Kunio, Hitachi Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Okamura, Hisanori, Hitachi Ltd. Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Tsukamoto, Takeshi, Hitachi Ltd. Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Kato, Takahiko, Hitachi Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Koshiishi, Masato, Hitachi Ltd. Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307571.0 | 01.09.2000 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | JP20000034308 | 07.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000034308 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122018 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122018 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122018 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/00, B23K26/14, G21C13/02, B23K26/12, G21C5/10, G21C13/087, B23K9/29 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
G21C13/087 (EP,US);
B23K9/16 (KR);
B23K26/1224 (EP,US);
B23K26/146 (EP,US);
B23K26/1476 (EP,US);
B23K9/0061 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | B23K9/00, B23K26/14, G21C13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Unterwasserbehandlungsanordnung und -verfahren | [2001/32] | English: | Unterwater processing device and underwater processing method | [2001/32] | French: | Dispositif de traitement sous l'eau et méthode de traitement sous l'eau | [2004/33] |
Former [2001/32] | Dispositifs de traitement sous l'eau et méthode de traitement sous l'eau | Examination procedure | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH081326 ; | [Y]JPH06289183 ; | [A]JPS56141965 ; | [A]JPH07132372 ; | [A]US4052632 (SAGARA HIDEO, et al) [A] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 2, line 68 - column 4, line 61; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5977515 (URAKI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 55; figures 1-5 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08001326 A 19960109 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 4,8,9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06289183 A 19941018 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820210), vol. 006, no. 023, Database accession no. (M - 111), & JP56141965 A 19811105 (NATL RES INST FOR METALS) [A] 1-3,6,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07132372 A 19950523 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 4,6,8,9 * abstract * |