EP1083757 - Stereoscopic image display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doudnikov, Sergey Office 521, UI, Shpalernaya 36 St. Petersburg 191123 / RU | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307824.3 | 11.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | KR19990038396 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: KR 9938396 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083757 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083757 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, H04N13/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/307 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP);
H04N13/189 (EP);
H04N13/194 (EP);
H04N13/229 (EP);
H04N13/232 (EP);
H04N13/286 (EP);
H04N13/31 (EP);
H04N13/334 (EP);
H04N13/337 (EP);
H04N13/341 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/12] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stereoskopische Bildanzeigevorrichtung | [2001/11] | English: | Stereoscopic image display apparatus | [2001/11] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'images stéréoscopiques | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2008 | 22.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/11] | 28.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2007 | 30.09.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04122922 ; | [Y]WO9944091 (HERTZ INST HEINRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 4-7 * page 6, line 8 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [XY] - TOMONO A ET AL, "OPTICAL DESIGN FOR A LARGE-SCREEN STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH EXTENDED OBSERVALBLE SPACE", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (19931101), vol. 76, no. 11, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 43 - 57, XP000438328 [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 43, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 44, column L, line 14 - line 23 * * page 45, column L, paragraph 2 * [Y] 4-7 | [XY] - ISONO H ET AL, "AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC 3-D TELEVISION", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (19930801), vol. 76, no. 8, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 89 - 97, XP000442299 [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 90, column R, lines 19-29,35-37 * [Y] 4-7 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920814), vol. 016, no. 382, Database accession no. (P - 1403), & JP04122922 A 19920423 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP ;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - MEIER K, "METHODS FOR DECISION MAKING WITH CARDINAL NUMBERS AND ADDITIVE AGGREGATION", FUZZY SETS AND SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970601), vol. 88, no. 2, ISSN 0165-0114, pages 135 - 159, XP000687274 [A] 1,4 * page 61, column L, paragraph L; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-0114(96)00049-8 | Examination | - HALLE M., "Autostereoscopic Displays and Computer Graphics", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, ACM, US, (19970501), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 58 - 62, XP000687247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/271283.271309 |