EP1095676 - Method of creating image frames, storage medium and program executing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanetaka, Katsuyuki, Sony Comp. Entertainm. Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
Fukui, Toshio, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308007.4 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990261136 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26113699 | JP20000233092 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000233092 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095676 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1095676 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, A63F13/10 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G06T13/60 (EP,US);
A63F2300/66 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6638 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6692 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | A63F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildergenerierungsverfahren, Speichermedium und Programmausführungsvorrichtung | [2001/18] | English: | Method of creating image frames, storage medium and program executing apparatus | [2001/18] | French: | Méthode d'image creation, moyen de stockage et dispositif d'execution de programme | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 26.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07328228 ; | [A]US5938530 (WATANABE KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1-6* figure 4 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07328228 A 19951219 (SEGA ENTERP LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 6 * * figures 4-6 * | [A] - TENG-SEE LOKE ET AL, "RENDERING FIREWORKS DISPLAYS", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19920501), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 33 - 43, XP000281872 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.135912 |