EP1143552 - Sheet-metal filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnett, Ron 813 Cherry Street Santa Rosa, California 95404 / US | 02 /
Ma, Zhengxiang 122 West End Avenue Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 03 /
Manzione, Louis Thomas 25 Druid Hill Road Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
Schwartz, Richard F. 3 Tanager Lane Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 05 /
Wu, Hui 1888 Manor Drive, Apt. D. Union, New Jersey 07083 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308083.5 | 18.09.2000 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000521556 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: US 521556 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143552 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/203, H01P11/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H01P1/20381 (EP,US);
H01P11/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Blattmetallfilter | [2001/41] | English: | Sheet-metal filter | [2001/41] | French: | Filtre à feuille de métal | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/45] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3104362 (MATTHAEI GEORGE L) [Y] 6,7 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5225799 (WEST LAURICE J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column W * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]US5352996 (KAWAGUCHI EI [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, line 7 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0766333 (SOLITRA OY [FI]) [A] 1* column 3, line 9 - line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6005455 (LINDELL PATRIK [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 43; figure 3 * |