EP1089193 - Translating apparatus and method, and recording medium used therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimomura, Hideki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Tajima, Kazuhiko, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Aoyagi, Seiichi, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Ogawa, Hiroaki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308403.5 | 25.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990277743 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27774399 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089193 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1089193 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G06F40/55 (EP,US);
G06F40/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/05] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übersetzungs-Apparat und -Verfahren und damit verwendetes Speichermedium | [2001/14] | English: | Translating apparatus and method, and recording medium used therewith | [2001/14] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traduction et médium de stockage utilisé avec cela | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0335710 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-6,10,11 * page 4, column 5, line 6 - line 15; figure 1 * * page 5, column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 15 * * page 6, column 10, line 45 - page 7, column 11, line 58 * [Y] 7-9; | [A]WO9743707 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 13; figure 1 ** page 23, line 1 - line 21 *; | [Y] - WAIBEL A, "INRERACTIVE TRANSLATION OF CONVERSATIONAL SPEECH", COMPUTER, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, US, (19960701), vol. 29, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 41 - 48, XP000621882 [Y] 7-9 * page 4, column 1, line 1 - line 6; figure 2 * * page 7, column 1, line 28 - line 60 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.511967 |