EP1088978 - Method and system for controlling fuel injection for direct inject-spark ignition engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hiroyuki c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Mamiya, Kiyotaka c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Araki, Keiji c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2001/14] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308434.0 | 26.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990278324 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27832499 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088978 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088978 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088978 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/08 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
F02D31/008 (EP,US);
F02D41/083 (EP,US);
F02D41/2438 (EP,US);
F02D41/2467 (EP,US);
F02D41/3023 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der direkten Kraftstoffeinspritzung in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/14] | English: | Method and system for controlling fuel injection for direct inject-spark ignition engine | [2001/14] | French: | Méthode et système pour contrôler l'injection de carburant dans un moteur à injection directe | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.04.2005 | IT | 06.04.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | GB | 26.09.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | IT | 06.04.2005 | |
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
GB | 26.09.2005 | ||
FR | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 06.04.2005 | |
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
GB | 26.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | ES | 17.07.2005 | |
GB | 26.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 17.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2323687 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * * page 12, line 1 - page 19, line 5 * * page 23, line 5 - page 28, line 2 * * figures 2,4,6,7,24A-25,32; claim - *; | [A]US5878711 (KAMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]GB2256945 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]WO9803783 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 12 * * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 21 * * page 28, line 1 - page 35, line 14 *; | [A]US4495920 (MATSUMURA TOSHIMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]US5685270 (SEKIGUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column W * |