EP1139014 - Light source device, and illuminating optical system and projector including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Koichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308500.8 | 28.09.2000 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000097211 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000097211 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139014 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139014 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/04, F21V7/08, G02B3/04, G02B27/18, H04N9/31, G03B21/20 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
F21V5/048 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0047 (EP,US);
G02B27/0927 (EP,US);
G02B27/0955 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B27/285 (EP,US);
G03B21/2026 (EP,US);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | F21V5/04, F21V7/08, G02B3/04, G02B27/18, H04N9/31 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtquelle, optisches Beleuchtungssystem und damit versehener Projektor | [2001/40] | English: | Light source device, and illuminating optical system and projector including the same | [2001/40] | French: | Source de lumière, système optique d'éclairage et projecteur l'utilisant | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP04077148.7 / EP1469252 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1422307 (SALVATORE SALTO) [X] 1,5-8 * page 1, line 26 - line 46 * * claim 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3296923 (MILES JOHN R) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 50 - line 54 * * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * column 3, line 32 - line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3702395 (ROSENDAHL GOTTFRIED R) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 53 - line 56 * * column 3, line 7 - line 11 * * column 4, line 9 - line 14 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US3944337 (RUBEN PAUL LEWIS) [A] 2,7,9,12* column 2, line 22 - line 39 *; | [A]FR2581211 (HARDWARE [FR]) [A] 1-16 * page 1, line 18 - line 25 * * page 5, line 1 - line 7 * * page 6, line 8 - line 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0395156 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-16 * column 24, line 51 - line 58 * * column 25, line 1 - line 5 * * column 25, line 14 - line 21 * * figures 23,25 *; | [A]US5155631 (SNYDER JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 9,12 * column 7, line 39 - line 68 * * column 8, line 1 - line 19 *; | [XA]US5541746 (HAMAGISHI GORO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column 4, line 19 - line 21 * * column 5, line 30 - line 51 * * column 7, line 26 - line 29 * * column 7, line 37 - line 46 * * figures 3,4,6,6B * [A] 4,7,9-16; | [A]US5662400 (SHIKAMA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 10,13 * column 16, line 10 - line 30 * * figure 13 *; | [A]US5918968 (CHOI SOON-CHEOL [KR]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 21 - line 38 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5969875 (SUGAWARA SABURO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * column 9, line 63 - line 67 * * column 10, line 1 - line 9 * * column 12, line 18 - line 23 * * figure 17A *; | [A]US5991098 (PARETO EUGENI JORDANA [ES]) [A] 9,12 * figures 3A,3B,4A,4B *; | [A] - SCHRÖDER G., Technische Optik, WÜRZBURG, VOGEL BUCHVERLAG, (1990), ISBN 380230067x219030, XP002222505 [A] 1-3,5-7,11 * page 54 - page 55 * | [A] - KINGSLAKE R., Lens Design Fundamentals, NEW YORK, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1978), ISBN 0124086501, XP002226848 [A] 9,12 * page 112 - page 113 * |