EP1088747 - Spare-tire fastening structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states EMHART LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Toshio c/o Pop Rivet Fastener K.K., Hosoda, Noyori-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker UK 210 Bath Road Berks, Slough SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308547.9 | 28.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990275754 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27575499 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088747 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088747 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D43/10 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
B62D43/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Notradbefestigungsstruktur | [2001/14] | English: | Spare-tire fastening structure | [2001/14] | French: | Structure de fixation de roue de secours | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10205513 ; | [DA]JPH07315255 ; | [A]DE29504407U (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 7,8 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10205513 A 19980804 (POP RIVET FASTENER KK) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07315255 A 19951205 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [DA] 5 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6070480U | JPS61190782U | JPH07315255 | JPH10205513 | JP2583778Y |