EP1092801 - Device for attenuating vibration of drum type washing machine and method for controlling washing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Dae Yeong 536-125, Kuro-dong, Kuro-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Jeon, Si Moon Shingudream House 901, 963-16, Pangbae 2-dong Socho-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Hong, Kyung Seop Poongrim 2cha Apt., 102-506, Tongchun 2-dong Yonsu-gu, Inchon-shi / KR | 04 /
Chang, Jae Won Mokreon Apt., 1241-1005, Sanbon-dong Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | [2001/21] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
Han, Dae Yeong Jookong Apt., 302-1305, 688, Tungchon-dong Kangso-gu, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Jeon, Si Moon Shingudream House 901, 963-16, Pangbae 2-dong Socho-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Hong, Kyung Seop Poongrim 2cha Apt., 102-506, Tongchun 2-dong Yonsu-gu, Inchon-shi / KR | |||
04 /
Chang, Jae Won Mokreon Apt., 1241-1005, Sanbon-dong Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308632.9 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | KR19990044382 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9944382 | KR19990044383 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9944383 | KR19990044384 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9944384 | KR19990044387 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: KR 9944387 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092801 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092801 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092801 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22, D06F37/26 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
D06F37/265 (EP,US);
D06F37/225 (EP,US);
D06F37/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2003/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Auswuchtvorrichtung für eine Trommelwaschmaschine und Verfahren zum Steuern des Waschprozesses | [2001/16] | English: | Device for attenuating vibration of drum type washing machine and method for controlling washing | [2001/16] | French: | Dispositif pour atténuer les vibrations dans une machine à laver à tambour et procédé pour contrôler le lavage | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3734234 (LASKOWSKI SIGISMUND [DE]) [X] 1,28 * claim 1 ** column 1, line 3 - line 41 *; | [X]EP0551067 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [X] 1-4,26-28 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 42 * * column 5, line 24 - line 47 *; | [X]DE4323163 (AUSTEL HARALD DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,28 * column 1, line 21 - line 47 * |