EP1122239 - Process for producing sulfonylimide compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morita Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 3-5-12, Hirano-machi, Chuou-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Morita Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 19-3 Toyosaki 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonezawa, Tetsuo, c/o Morita Chem. Ind. Co., Ltd. 12-10 Higashimikuni 3-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0002 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Yoshitaka, Morita Chem. Ind. Co., Ltd. 12-10 Higashimikuni 3-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0002 / JP | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308751.7 | 04.10.2000 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | JP20000021578 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000021578 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122239 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/38, C07C311/48 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
C07C303/38 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/38, C07C311/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Sulfonylimidverbindung | [2001/32] | English: | Process for producing sulfonylimide compound | [2001/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un composé sulfonylimide | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |