EP1099916 - Combustion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RINNAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2006/02] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Shigeki, Rinnai KK 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nagakawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Mori, Kinji, Rinnai KK 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nagakawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Okada, Sadao, Rinnai KK 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nagakawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Tajima, Naoki, Rinnai KK 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nagakawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Abrams, Michael John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309446.3 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19990322852 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32285299 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099916 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099916 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099916 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24H8/00 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
F24H8/006 (EP);
F24H1/00 (KR);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2003/36] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbrennungsgerät | [2001/20] | English: | Combustion device | [2001/20] | French: | Appareil de combustion | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08173977 ; | [X]DE3151418 (HERRMANN KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1 * page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4478158 (SMITH ROBERT W [CA]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [X]DE4240428 (RUHRGAS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1063480 (RINNAI KK [JP]) [E] 1-3* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08173977 A 19960709 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0519703U |