EP1100213 - Method and apparatus for receiving wireless transmissions using multiple-antenna arrays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassibi, Babak 1 JFK Blvd. Apt. 45L Somerset, New Jersey, 08873 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309582.5 | 30.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990438900 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: US 438900 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100213 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1100213 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/0854 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03605 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03611 (EP,US);
H04L25/0246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für den Empfang von Funkübertragungen mittels mehrerer Antennengruppen | [2006/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for receiving wireless transmissions using multiple-antenna arrays | [2001/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la réception de signaux de radiodiffusion utilisant des réseaux d'antennes multiples | [2001/20] |
Former [2001/20] | Verfharen und Vorrichtung für den Empfang von Funkübertragungen mittels mehrerer Antennengruppen | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/12] | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0899896 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 44 - page 8, paragraph 63 * * figures 3-5 * [A] 2-7; | [A]WO9631010 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 19 *; | [A]WO9800930 (CHOI SEUNG WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 13 * | [A] - HASSIBI B ET AL, "On a closed form solution to the constant modulus factorization problem", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 1994. 1994 CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TWENTY-EIGHTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA 31 OCT.-2 NOV. 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19941031), ISBN 0-8186-6405-3, pages 775 - 779, XP010148840 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1994.471567 |