EP1098484 - Multicarrier receiver, particularly for DAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moss, Peter Neil, c/o British Broadcasting Corp. Res. & Development Dept, Kingswood Warren Tadworth, Surrey KT20 6NP / GB | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309679.9 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | US19990432255 | 02.11.1999 Original published format: US 432255 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098484 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1098484 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04H1/00, H04L5/02 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | H04L27/26, H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/39] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrträgerempfänger, insbesondere für digitalen Hörfunk | [2001/19] | English: | Multicarrier receiver, particularly for DAB | [2001/19] | French: | Récepteur multiporteuse, en particulier pour la radiodiffusion numérique | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0772310 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [Y] 1-15* page 15, line 1 - line 8 *; | [Y]WO9851049 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |