EP1170183 - Articulation system between windscreen wiper components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eletromecânica Dyna S/A Rua Barao do Rio Branco, 46 Guarulhos, SP / BR | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nacamuli, Marc Rua Bahia, 377, apto. 191 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309752.4 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | BR20000003099 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: BR 0003099 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170183 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170183 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B60S1/3801 (EP,US);
B60S2001/3815 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32885 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32951 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/23] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gelenkvorrichtung zwischen Scheibenwischerkomponenten | [2002/02] | English: | Articulation system between windscreen wiper components | [2002/02] | French: | Articulation entre composants d'essuie-glace | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 19.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 15.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0281397 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12* column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 53; figures 2-6 *; | [X]DE4439276 (JOURNEE PAUL SA [FR]) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 61 *; | [X]US5819361 (MERKEL WILFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, lines 36-40 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 24; figures 8-11 * |