EP1203844 - Liquid dosing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Slade, Brian 20 Star Road Ashford Kent TN24 8BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Slade, Brian 20 Star Road Ashford, Kent TN24 8BX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309776.3 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203844 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/03 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
E03D9/032 (EP,US);
A47K3/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/05] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdosiervorrichtungen | [2002/19] | English: | Liquid dosing devices | [2002/19] | French: | Dispositifs de dosage de liquide | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9220876 (BROOKLINE ALPHA LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 4, line 19 - line 29 * * page 5, line 1 - line 33 * * page 7, line 1 - line 14 * * figures 1-4 * [A] ; | [X]US5597255 (YAGER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * column 3, line 41 - line 59 ** figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO0049238 (RECKITT & COLMAN FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 11 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 12 * * figures 14,17,18,21 *; | [A]EP1046755 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [A] 6,7 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 11 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0785315 |